Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet, Keri L, against Salazar, Alexandria, represented by Chowdhury, Ian, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case reassigned from Mangione,James to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021
Date: 2021-11-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Salazar, Alexandria.
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF CMC) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Civil Court Trial vacated for 01/13/2023 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Salazar, Alexandria.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 09/18/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: September 18, 2023Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 08/25/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: August 25, 2023Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Salazar, Alexandria
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Amended Motion (TO DEEM ADMISSIONS) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 28, 2023Exhibit List filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 09, 2023Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Date: 2023-03-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/03/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Salazar, Alexandria
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 09, 2023Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 15, 2023Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to Richard Strauss effective 05/04/2021
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Capital One Bank USA NA received but not filed on 09/23/2021.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/07/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: September 18, 2023Case reassigned from Braner,Matthew to Freestone,Loren effective 07/30/2022
Date: 2022-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Salazar, Alexandria
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/26/2022 11:10:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 09, 2023The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Salazar, Alexandria
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Witness List filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: August 09, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.