Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Jessica Elias, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Harry M. Elias presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarry M. Elias Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: March 03, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: March 03, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service by Publication filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: April 09, 2021Decree Changing Name filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: April 20, 2021Petition for Change of Name filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 04/20/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: April 20, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Martinez, Jessica Elias received but not filed on 03/03/2021.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Jessica Elias.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.