Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anderson, Earl, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Rangel-Monjaras, Carlos, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/18/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied without prejudice. | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/18/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by ANDERSON, EARL. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/20/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (affidavit of canceled service) filed by ANDERSON, EARL. | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department C-61.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by ANDERSON, EARL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.