Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bachelor, Justin, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Recordon, Stephen G; Rooney, Clinton, against Crown Asset Management Llc, represented by Kaminski, David J; Kumar, Matthew J; Schannong, Martin, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bachelor, Justin. Refers to: Crown Asset Management LLC
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.
Date: August 16, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Bachelor, Justin.
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: August 27, 2021Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/27/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: August 27, 2021Association of Attorney filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.
Date: July 12, 2021General Denial filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.
Date: June 02, 2021Amended Answer filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.
Date: July 12, 2021Original Summons filed by Bachelor, Justin. Refers to: Crown Asset Management LLC
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.