Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Moore, Jermaine Lamar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sadr, Kasra, against Sherzai Motors, Inc; Dba : European Auto Connection, Western Surety Company, represented by Martinez-Genzon, Rosa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Moore, Jermaine Lamar. Refers to: Sherzai Motors, Inc; Western Surety Company
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Moore, Jermaine Lamar.
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: December 28, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Western Surety Company.
Date: December 23, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Answer filed by Western Surety Company.
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.