Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robinson, Christine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clune, John, Nichols, Andrea M, against Access Professional, Inc., Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander, represented by Haycraft, Kim, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/28/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: February 28, 2023Complaint filed by Robinson, Christine. Refers to: Pimentel, Nicolas; Access Professional, Inc.
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 08/26/2022 09:14:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Robinson, Christine. Refers to: Pimentel, Nicolas; Access Professional, Inc.
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 08/05/2022 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/16/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Proposed Order (12/14) filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Robinson, Christine; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: February 15, 2023Demand for Jury Trial filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation Regarding Trial Date Selection) filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/16/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Answer filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Objections filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander; Access Professional, Inc..
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (12/14) filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Robinson, Christine.
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Access Professional, Inc.; Pimentel, Nicolas Alexander.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/17/2023 09:15:00 AM.
Date: February 17, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.