Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ferrari, Colleen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morrison, Rebecca Blain, against Diaz, Caleb, Guerrero-Barrientos, Rafael, represented by Zidan, Kaled, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ferrari, Colleen.
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Ferrari, Colleen.
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Ferrari, Colleen. Refers to: Diaz, Caleb
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/29/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: February 07, 2023Complaint filed by Ferrari, Colleen. Refers to: Diaz, Caleb; Guerrero-Barrientos, Rafael
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Ferrari, Colleen. Refers to: Diaz, Caleb; Guerrero-Barrientos, Rafael
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Ferrari, Colleen; Diaz, Caleb.
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ferrari, Colleen.
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 10/28/2022 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name submitted by Diaz, Caleb rejected on 07/28/2021. Refers to: Diaz, Caleb
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.