Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garcia, Orlando, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Handy, Russell Clive, against Palatine Sd Llc, Sant Kabir Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew C. Braner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service by Mail filed by Garcia, Orlando.
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Orlando. Refers to: Palatine SD LLC; Sant Kabir LLC
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Hearing filed by Garcia, Orlando.
Date: January 26, 2022Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/24/2022 11:45:00 AM.
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: June 24, 2022Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Garcia, Orlando.
Date: June 24, 2022Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from Mangione,James to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021
Date: 2021-11-11T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Garcia, Orlando. Refers to: Palatine SD LLC; Sant Kabir LLC
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Orlando.
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/21/2022 11:45:00 AM.
Date: January 21, 2022Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Orlando.
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Complaint filed by Garcia, Orlando. Refers to: Palatine SD LLC; Sant Kabir LLC
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.