Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ayers, Tracy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cline, Brian K., Moses, Jeffrey, against General Motors Llc, represented by Davis, Stacey S, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: December 17, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: February 05, 2021Request for Dismissal (not entered) filed by Ayers, Tracy.
Date: January 28, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ayers, Tracy. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: February 05, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Ayers, Tracy.
Date: December 02, 2021Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/17/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 17, 2021Answer filed by Ayers, Tracy.
Date: March 10, 2021Original Summons filed by Ayers, Tracy. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Complaint filed by Ayers, Tracy. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.