Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Lee, Lai Sin, Leung, Shirley Ngai Suet, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Liu, Youjun, against Cheng, John Keung, Cheung, Gillien Man, Lam, Tiet C, represented by Cannistraci, Sharonrose, Chou, Debbie M., Hadwan, Mohamad, Nunez, Steven M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Marcella O McLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarcella O McLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Lee, Lai Sin. Refers to: Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung; Lam, Tiet
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Demurrer (as to the Second Amended Complaint) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lee, Lai Sin. Refers to: Lam, Tiet
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Answer filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/14/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Demurrer (TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Demurrer) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint (THIRD) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 05/20/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Answer filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Answer filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/27/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Lee, Lai Sin received but not filed on 08/29/2022.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Youjun Liu) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/24/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/02/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/19/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (John Cheng) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Gillien Man Cheung) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (STEVEN M NUÑEZ) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/07/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF YOUJUN LIU) filed by Suet Leung, Shirley Ngai.
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Cheng, John Keung; Cheung, Gillien Man.
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Cheng, John Keung; Cheung, Gillien Man.
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/17/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Motion - Other (TO TAX COSTS) filed by Suet Leung, Shirley Ngai.
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF DEBORAH REISDORPH) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF GILLIEN MAN CHEUNG) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung received but not filed on 06/12/2023.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/13/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Deborah Reisdorph) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Objections filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Interpreter Request (Cantonese) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Interpreter Request (Cantonese) filed by Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Youjun Liu) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 07/19/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Lee, Lai Sin received but not filed on 10/17/2023.
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Youjun Liu) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF MOHAMAD HADWAN) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 07/14/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF YOUJUN LIU IN) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Opposition - Other (TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/27/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-07-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 07/18/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 288]
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN PART) filed by Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (Notice of Demurrer) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Case reassigned from Taylor,Timothy to McLaughlin,Marcella effective 10/14/2023
Date: 2023-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF DAN HATFIELD) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-09-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Rescheduled Motion to Strike / Tax Costs) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00Objections filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Lam, Tiet C received but not filed on 11/18/2022.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 324]
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF SHARONROSE CANNISTRACI) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2024-02-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2024-03-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Default (RT fees) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00Opposition - Other (TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2024-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2024-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: March 08, 2024Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: March 08, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2024-03-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: March 08, 2024Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 06/23/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/29/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Affidavit - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: March 11, 2024Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2024-02-16T00:00:00Objections filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/15/2024 01:30:00 PM.
Date: March 15, 2024Statement of Decision filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-09-18T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Lee, Lai Sin received but not filed on 08/15/2022.
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheng, John Keung; Cheung, Gillien Man.
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Motion - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Amended Motion filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (AMENDED) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Interpreter Request (Vietnamese) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 06/30/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Order - Other filed by Cheng, John Keung; Cheung, Gillien Man.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Lee, Lai Sin; Cheng, John Keung; Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Youjun Liu) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 07/17/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF PHAT TRAN) filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Appeal filed by Lee, Lai Sin. Refers to: Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung; Lam, Tiet
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: 2024-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2024-02-27T00:00:00Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Objections filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-11-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: March 14, 2024Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: March 13, 2024Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (D083567 Debbie K Wood) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Cheung, Gillien Man.
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 04/21/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF TIET C LAMS) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF MOHAMAD HADWAN ESQ) filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lee, Lai Sin.
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Cheung, Gillien Man; Cheng, John Keung.
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lam, Tiet C.
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.