Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Keyes, Tanya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph, James, against Arroyo, Magdaleno, Sunbelt Rentals Inc., represented by Blum, Fred M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: February 03, 2021Original Summons filed by KEYES, TANYA. Refers to: ARROYO, MAGDALENO; SUNBELT RENTALS INC.
Date: February 11, 2021Answer filed by SUNBELT RENTALS INC..
Date: April 01, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by KEYES, TANYA. Refers to: ARROYO, MAGDALENO; SUNBELT RENTALS INC.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: May 26, 2021Complaint filed by KEYES, TANYA. Refers to: ARROYO, MAGDALENO; SUNBELT RENTALS INC.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.