Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez, Joam, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Dieguez, Marcelo A, against Maderas Partners Lp; Dba : Maderas Golf Club, represented by Ferrantella, Jesse C.; Johnson, Timothy L; Skeen, Spencer C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert P Dahlquist Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration - Other (5/28/21) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Martinez, Joam.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jesse C Ferrantella 5/28/2021) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Complaint filed by Martinez, Joam. Refers to: Maderas Partners LP
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Joam. Refers to: Maderas Partners LP
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Martinez, Joam. Refers to: Maderas Partners LP
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: June 11, 2021Motion - Other (to Compel Arbitration 5/28/2021) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration - Other filed by Martinez, Joam.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Martinez, Joam.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/04/2021 02:30:00 PM.
Date: June 04, 2021Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/28/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: May 28, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities (5/28/2021) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proposed Order (5/28/2021) submitted by Maderas Partners LP received but not filed on 03/12/2021.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (5/28/21) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Objections filed by Martinez, Joam.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Reply (5/28/21) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Objections (5/28/21) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Martinez, Joam.
Date: November 22, 2021Declaration - Other (of Jud Grubbs 5/28/2021) filed by Maderas Partners LP.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.