Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcneal, Shadeana, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Pancer, Ian, against Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Walmart Associates Inc, Walmart Inc; Esa : Walmart Inc.;Esa : Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Stores Inc, represented by King, Cory, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Demurrer (to answer) filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Answer filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Ian Pancer) filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Amended Motion (AMENDED DEMURRER) filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/12/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Amended Answer filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by WalMart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order Remanding Case to Originating Court filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 10/28/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: October 28, 2022Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/01/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/18/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Motion for Order to Stay Proceedings filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/09/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 09, 2022Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/16/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: December 16, 2022Case reassigned from Judge Mangione, James A to Timothy Taylor effective 07/14/2022
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Amended Answer (Second) filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by McNeal, Shadeana.
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Carolyn Caietti effective 08/02/2022
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF CORY J. KING) filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc.
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc received but not filed on 04/26/2022.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Stipulation - Other filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/30/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: September 30, 2022Peremptory Challenge filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.