Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Isozaki, Ryota, against Weston, Marisa S, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Discover Bank.
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: September 22, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: June 22, 2022Declaration - Other filed by Discover Bank.
Date: May 23, 2022Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes
Date: March 28, 2022E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: March 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD generated.
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Weston, Marisa
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 12]
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Discover Bank.
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.