Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yang, Rebecca Y, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Gore, William D, Superior Court Of The State Of California, County Of San Diego, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (order dismissing writ petition as moot) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (ALTERNATIVE WRIT ORDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney filed by SYMPHONY ASSET POOL XXV LLC. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Symphony Asset Pool XXV, LLC's Exhibits in Support of Preliminary Opposition to Writ of Mandate Vol 2. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and Other Appropriate Relief filed by Symphony Asset Pool XXV, LLC. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Symphony Asset Pool XXV, LLC's Exhibits in Support of Preliminary Opposition to Writ of Mandate Vol 1. | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by YANG, REBECCA Y. | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (order on Writ of Mandate) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate to Appellate Division (Underlying Case Jurisdiction > $10K but not > $25K) filed by YANG, REBECCA Y. Refers to: SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO; GORE, WILLIAM; SYMPHONY ASSET POOL XXV LLC; DOWNEY, JAMES | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department Appellate Division. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.