Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mostowy, Ronald, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Cadle, Timothy J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/24/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied with out prejudice. | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Cadle, Timothy J. Refers to: Mostowy, Ronald | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Cadle, Timothy J. | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Firearms Turned In or Sold filed by Cadle, Timothy J. Refers to: Mostowy, Ronald | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Respondent Timothy Cadle in Response to, in Opposition of, Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders [3/24/2021]) filed by Cadle, Timothy J. Refers to: Mostowy, Ronald | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration by June Cadle [3/24/2021]) filed by Cadle, Timothy J. Refers to: Mostowy, Ronald | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodgment filed by Mostowy, Ronald. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.