Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Colon, Bertha, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Galindo, Roxana, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Order After Hearing by Mail filed by Colon, Bertha. Refers to: Galindo, Roxana | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) (Amended) filed by Colon, Bertha. Refers to: Galindo, Roxana | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Colon, Bertha. Refers to: Galindo, Roxana | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Respondent, Roxanna Galindo was granted. | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/23/2021 01:30:00 PM. | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 was vacated. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 . | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by Galindo, Roxana. Refers to: Colon, Bertha | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (CHTRO) filed by Colon, Bertha. Refers to: Galindo, Roxana |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.