Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Schwab, Brian, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Frankel, Lauren M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/14/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/15/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
The Hearing on Restraining Order was rescheduled to 07/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in C-61 before at Central.
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .
Judge: Daniel F. Link |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Schwab, Brian. | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/15/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Frankel, Lauren M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.