Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Esse, Grace,
Gin, Mary,
against
Higgins, Marcus D,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Kelly C. Mertsoc presiding.
Case Details for
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A v. Higgins, Marcus D
Parties for
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A v. Higgins, Marcus D
Plaintiffs
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Esse, Grace
Gin, Mary
Defendants
Higgins, Marcus D
Case Documents for
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A v. Higgins, Marcus D
Case Events for
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc., As Servicer For Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A v. Higgins, Marcus D
Date
Type
Description
March 06, 2023
Docket Event
Proof of Service filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A.
February 06, 2023
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Higgins, Marcus
February 06, 2023
Docket Event
Amended Complaint (**FIRST**) filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Higgins, Marcus
February 06, 2023
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Higgins, Marcus
January 29, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-03 to N-10 effective 01/29/2023.
August 01, 2022
Docket Event
Stipulation - Other (Requests) Stipulation - Other (STIPULATION FOR COURT COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES) filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A.
Judge: FOR ALL PURPOSES) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services Inc as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A
February 17, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A.
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Higgins, Marcus
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., as Servicer for Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Higgins, Marcus