Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bogart Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vance, Thomas L, against Kashou Climate Control Inc, represented by Cleeland, Bruce L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Witness List filed by Bogart Construction Inc.
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kashou Climate Control Inc.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer filed by Kashou Climate Control Inc.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Bogart Construction Inc.
Date: April 01, 2022Advance Trial Review Order filed by Bogart Construction Inc.
Date: April 08, 2022Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Complaint filed by Bogart Construction Inc. Refers to: Kashou Climate Control Inc
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: July 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bogart Construction Inc. Refers to: Kashou Climate Control Inc
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 04/22/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit List filed by Bogart Construction Inc.
Date: April 01, 2022Original Summons filed by Bogart Construction Inc. Refers to: Kashou Climate Control Inc
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Bogart Construction Inc.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.