Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbour, Marie, Barbour, Patricia, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Garcia, Stephen M, against Alkema, Shaun, Barbour Bedoe, Anne-Marie, Ensign Services Inc, La Jolla Skilled Inc, La Jolla Skilled Inc; Esa : La Jolla Skilled Inc;Dba : The Springs At Pacific Regent, (total of 6) See All represented by Mcgill, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Barbour, Marie; Barbour, Patricia.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Barbour, Marie; Barbour, Patricia.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer filed by Barbour Bedoe, Anne-Marie.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Barbour, Marie; Barbour, Patricia.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Barbour Bedoe, Anne-Marie.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Barbour Bedoe, Anne-Marie.
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Barbour, Marie; Barbour, Patricia.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer filed by Alkema, Shaun; The Ensign Group Inc; Ensign Services Inc; La Jolla Skilled Inc.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.