Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Crayton Iii, Clarence, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Simowitz, Mark B; Woodard, Paul D., against Christopher M Dudzik Dmd Inc; Dba : Carlsbad Village Dentistry, Dudzik, Dmd, Christopher M, represented by Poliquin, Mark Peter, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert P Dahlquist Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proposed Order (1/10/23) submitted by Crayton, Clarence III received but not filed on 01/09/2023.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/10/23) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (and Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/10/23) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Mark P Poliquin ISO MSJ [7/22/22]) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (1/10/23) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/27/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (7/22/22) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/10/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/10/23) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Proposed Order (7/22/22) submitted by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M received but not filed on 04/28/2022.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order (1/10/23) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Answer filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (1/10/23) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M; Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (ISO MSJ [7/22/22]) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (2/24/2023) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 03/07/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/27/2023 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 03/02/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/10/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine (#3) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 03/06/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine (#1) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Proposed Order (2/24/2023) submitted by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M received but not filed on 02/17/2023.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Brief - Other (Statement of the Case) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#4) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Exhibit List filed by Crayton, Clarence III; Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine (#2) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 03/01/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (and ORDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Verdict filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Witness List filed by Crayton, Clarence III; Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/28/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 03/08/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Verdict (proposed) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits filed by Crayton, Clarence III; Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: August 11, 2023Proposed Order filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: June 06, 2023Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: May 30, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/19/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: May 19, 2023Proposed Order (5/19/2023) submitted by Crayton, Clarence III received but not filed on 04/13/2023.
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: May 30, 2023Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (5/19/2023) filed by Crayton, Clarence III.
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Judgment on Verdict filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M. Refers to: Crayton, Clarence
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Dudzik, DMD, Christopher M.
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.