State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Insurance Coverage -
Insurance
case
represented by
Mahfouz Ii, Richard L.,
against
Delgadillo, Helen,
Oliver, Quincy Travon,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Details for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Delgadillo, Helen
, et al.
Case Events for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Delgadillo, Helen
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 02, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/06/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.
June 01, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
June 01, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to DELGADILLO, HELEN .
June 01, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
June 01, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Oliver, Quincy Travon .
March 10, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: DELGADILLO, HELEN
March 10, 2021
Docket Event
The default filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company was entered as to DELGADILLO, HELEN on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.
January 20, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
January 13, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Oliver, Quincy; DELGADILLO, HELEN