Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vedic Life'S Forbidden Juicery Llc; Dba : Cuppa Juice Garden Cafe, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Martini, J. Domenic, against Baldwin & Sons, Inc., Quail Meadows Properties, Llc, The City Of Encinitas, represented by Dean, Mitchell D; Radochonski, Joseph M, Tee, Stephen F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC. Refers to: The City of Encinitas
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC. Refers to: The City of Encinitas
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion 4/21/2023) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/10/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (4/21/2023) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Separate Statement (ISO Motion 4/21/2023) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/08/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to Continue Trial) filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Continuing Trial) filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO Motion 4/21/2023) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc..
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Answer filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc.; Quail Meadows Properties, LLC.
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Answer filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proposed Order (2/10/2021) filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc.; Quail Meadows Properties, LLC.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by The City of Encinitas.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: August 30, 2023Proof of Service filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: August 31, 2023Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Vedic Life's Forbidden Juicery LLC.
Date: August 29, 2023Proof of Service filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc.; Quail Meadows Properties, LLC.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Continuing Trial) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc.; Quail Meadows Properties, LLC.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (02/27/23) filed by Baldwin & Sons, Inc.; Quail Meadows Properties, LLC.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.