Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Friedman, Joshua P, against Xaisongkham, Enoy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Refers to: Xaisongkham, Enoy
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Refers to: Xaisongkham, Enoy
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Complaint filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Refers to: Xaisongkham, Enoy
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 24]
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 31]
Date: January 21, 2022[Another document for ROA# 16]
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Date: January 04, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (NOT ENTERED) filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Date: January 04, 2022Request for Entry of Default filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Refers to: Xaisongkham, Enoy
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration - Other (Summary of Case) filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.