Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tyson, Amy, Tyson, Andrew, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Applbaum, Marc, against Hall, Aaron, Pineda, Truly B, Urban Coast Properties Inc, Winter-Nolte, John H, represented by Schwartz, Edwin Neal, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Applbaum, Marc. Refers to: Tyson, Emma
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Applbaum, Marc. Refers to: Tyson, Gunner
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by TYSON, ANDREW; TYSON, AMY.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Compromise of Claim heard 02/24/2021 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by WINTER-NOLTE, JOHN H; URBAN COAST PROPERTIES INC.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.