Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connect By American Family, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schwarz, Marc A, against Delacruz, Rodrigo Salazar, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: August 20, 2021Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Connect By American Family.
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/02/2021 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Connect By American Family. Refers to: Delacruz, Rodrigo
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Connect By American Family. Refers to: Delacruz, Rodrigo
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Connect By American Family.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 09:45:00 AM.
Date: August 20, 2021Declaration - Other filed by Connect By American Family. Refers to: Delacruz, Rodrigo
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.