Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Snider, Gerald, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Macias, Sean E, Reichman, Robert E, against Walmart Inc; Esa : Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal Mart Stores Inc, represented by Kohn, Andrew N, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Answer filed by WAL MART STORES INC.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/08/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF UNAVAILABILITY) filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/19/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Change of Hearing Date) filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/14/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by WAL MART STORES INC.
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Snider, Gerald. Refers to: Walmart Inc
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Complaint filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: March 29, 2023Proof of Service filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 99]
Date: March 27, 2023Proposed Order submitted by Walmart Inc received but not filed on 11/16/2022.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Request for Admission Deemed Admitted) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Christine E Boisclair) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/18/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Status Conference) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Initial Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One)) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Christine E Boisclair) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Initial Responses to Request for Production (set one)) filed by Walmart Inc.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Snider, Gerald.
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.