Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hall, Jeanette, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Levin, Ellen; Martinian, Tigran, against Walgreens Co; Esa : Walgreens Company Dba Walgreens, represented by Holtz, James Frederick, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hall, Jeanette. Refers to: Walgreens CO
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Complaint filed by Hall, Jeanette. Refers to: Walgreens CO
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 6]
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/06/2021 10:15:00 AM.
Date: August 06, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Walgreens CO.
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Walgreens CO.
Date: November 01, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Hall, Jeanette. Refers to: Walgreens CO
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Walgreens CO.
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Unavailability of Counsel) filed by Walgreens CO.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hall, Jeanette.
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Hall, Jeanette.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Walgreens CO.
Date: July 19, 2021E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.