Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garibon, Gari, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Petrov, Daniel, against Siegal, Ana M, Siegal, Ernest, represented by Johnson, Spencer, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Garibon, Gari. Refers to: Siegal, Ernest; Siegal, Ana
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Garibon, Gari. Refers to: Siegal, Ernest; Siegal, Ana
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garibon, Gari. Refers to: Siegal, Ernest; Siegal, Ana
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Garibon, Gari.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Garibon, Gari.
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Siegal, Ana M; Siegal, Ernest.
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Siegal, Ana M; Siegal, Ernest.
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00General Denial (to complaint) filed by Siegal, Ana M; Siegal, Ernest.
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Garibon, Gari.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Siegal, Ana M; Siegal, Ernest.
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Garibon, Gari.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Garibon, Gari.
Date: June 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.