We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ,
filed a(n)
Insurance Coverage -
Insurance
case
represented by
Mahfouz Ii, Richard L. ,
against
Alvarado, Felix ,
Pedro, Martin Marcos ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with James A Mangione presiding.
Filing Date
November 30, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 05, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Filing Court House
Superior
Plaintiffs
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Events for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Alvarado, Felix
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 04, 2022
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
January 04, 2022
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Pedro, Martin Marcos .
January 04, 2022
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Alvarado, Felix .
October 30, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Get Document
October 06, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
Get Document
September 16, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Get Document
September 16, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.
September 13, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Pedro, Martin; Alvarado, Felix
Get Document
November 30, 2020
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.
Judge: Strauss Richard
November 30, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.