Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pimentel, Eddie ; Dba : Mercado De Autos, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by La Costa, Joseph, against Cone, Linda D, Cone, Peter M, Cone Properties Gp, Illiff, Steve, Leppert, John, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by OTA Y YARDS LLC.
Date: August 05, 2021Proof of Service filed by OTA Y YARDS LLC.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit submitted by PIMENTEL, EDDIE rejected on 02/22/2021.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (not entered) filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Denied in Part) filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by OTA Y YARDS LLC.
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/02/2021 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by PIMENTEL, EDDIE.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.