Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
United Financial Casualty Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against O'Campo-Camacho, Carolina, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert P Dahlquist Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
The default filed by United Financial Casualty Company was denied.
Date: April 06, 2021Original Summons filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Refers to: O'Campo-Camacho, Carolina
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: May 03, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Refers to: O'Campo-Camacho, Carolina
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: April 16, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.