Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vasquez, Alec, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Boulaev, Olesia, Zeesman, Alexander J, against Liu, Brian, Liu, Shih Hou, represented by Haynes-Garretty, Reetha Lenore, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer filed by Liu, Brian; Liu, Shih Hou.
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Vasquez, Alec.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: June 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vasquez, Alec. Refers to: Liu, Shih; Liu, Brian
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: June 06, 2023Substitution of Attorney filed by Vasquez, Alec.
Date: May 13, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Vasquez, Alec.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Liu, Brian; Liu, Shih Hou.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Liu, Brian; Liu, Shih Hou.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Complaint filed by Vasquez, Alec. Refers to: Liu, Shih; Liu, Brian
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Liu, Brian; Liu, Shih Hou.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Vasquez, Alec. Refers to: Liu, Shih; Liu, Brian
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: July 22, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/08/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.