Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Butcher, Donald, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kitsinian, Nareg S, against Lawrence Welk Resort Villas Vacation Owners Association, Welk Hospitality Group Inc, Welk Hospitality Management Inc, Welk Resort Group Inc, Welk Resort Properties Inc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[Another document for ROA# 14]
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 17]
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 11]
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Welk Hospitality Group Inc; Welk Hospitality Management Inc
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Lawrence Welk Resort Villas Vacation Owners Association
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Welk Resorts Vacation Rentals Inc
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 23]
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Welk Resorts Platinum Owners Association
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: August 13, 2021Proof of Service filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: August 13, 2021Proof of Service filed by Butcher, Donald.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/06/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Welk Resorts Vacation Rentals Inc
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Welk Resort Group Inc; Welk Resort Properties Inc
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.