Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andre Nunis As Successor In Interest To Decedent Oral Nunis, Estate Of Oral W Nunis Sr By And Through Roxie A Nunis, Nunis, Abigail Tabitha, Nunis, Jabez Caleb, Nunis, Naomi, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Douglas, Carl E; Hicks, Jamon R, Self-Represented, against Arce, David, Brian Olson In Official Capacity As A Police Officer For The City Of Chula Vista Police Department, Chula Vista, City Of Chula Vista, David Rivers In Official Capacity As A Police Officer For The City Of Chula Vista Police Department, (total of 8) See All represented by Googins, Glen R; Sain, Tony, Sain, Tony, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W Pollack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W Pollack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order - Other filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Attorney Tony M Sain) filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Demurrer filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/14/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/07/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by City of Chula Vista received but not filed on 05/07/2021.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Reply filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Estate of Oral W Nunis Sr by and through Roxie A Nunis.
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE Motion to Strike) filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/15/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Estate of Oral W Nunis Sr by and through Roxie A Nunis.
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD generated.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.