Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pham, Thomas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mohamadi, Ashkahn, against Betty J Bogosian As A Trustee Of The Betty Jo Bogosian Trust, Bogosian, Betty J, Hazelbaker, Thomas, Midway Venture Llc, Mohney, Jason, (total of 8) See All represented by Zulch, William F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Pham, Thomas.
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pham, Thomas.
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pham, Thomas.
Date: June 25, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Pham, Thomas. Refers to: Midway Venture LLC
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order - Other (Protective Order for Discovery) filed by Midway Venture LLC.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pham, Thomas. Refers to: Mohney, Jason
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by Pham, Thomas.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Pham, Thomas. Refers to: Mohney, Jason
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pham, Thomas. Refers to: Mohney, Jason
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.