State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Reese, Breanne L,
against
Esquivel, Fernando,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Details for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Esquivel, Fernando
Case Events for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Esquivel, Fernando
Date
Type
Description
April 20, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.
April 19, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Esquivel, Fernando .
April 19, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General) Proof of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
April 19, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
April 19, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal) Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
January 20, 2021
Docket Event
Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) Declaration of Due Diligence filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Esquivel, Fernando
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Summons issued.
November 24, 2020
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 (Case Initiation) Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Esquivel, Fernando