We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
National Funding Inc ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Muren, Tara ,
against
Love My Dog Resort And Spa Llc ,
Skott, Kathleen ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Filing Date
November 24, 2020
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
August 05, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Filing Court House
Superior
Defendants
Love My Dog Resort And Spa Llc
Case Events for
National Funding Inc v. Love My Dog Resort And Spa Llc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 29, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.
June 25, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by National Funding Inc.
Get Document
June 25, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to LOVE MY DOG RESORT AND SPA LLC.
June 25, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to National Funding Inc.
June 25, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to SKOTT, KATHLEEN .
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Summons issued.
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.
November 24, 2020
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.
Judge: Bacal Katherine
November 24, 2020
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: LOVE MY DOG RESORT AND SPA LLC; SKOTT, KATHLEEN
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.