Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Regency Centers Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Park, Ernie Zachary, against Jc Usa Inc, Jc Usa Inc; Dba : Jenny Craig Weight Loss Centre, represented by Berwanger, Charles V, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Statement filed by JC USA INC.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Regency Centers LP.
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by JC USA INC.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Regency Centers LP. Refers to: JC USA Inc
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Answer filed by JC USA INC.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Regency Centers LP. Refers to: JC USA Inc
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by JC USA INC.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Complaint filed by Regency Centers LP. Refers to: JC USA Inc; JC USA INC
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: June 25, 2021Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: January 12, 2022Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: April 22, 2022Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: January 12, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/25/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.