Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Newrez Llc; Dba : Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klein, Bradford E., against Brown, Frank P, Castillo, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of Due Diligence filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Complaint filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank; CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank; CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Judgment filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank; CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: September 21, 2021Request - Other (For Waiver of Live Testimony) filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 11:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Request for Dismissal of Does filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank; CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: September 15, 2021Original Summons filed by NewRez LLC. Refers to: Brown, Frank; CASTILLO, NANCY
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by NewRez LLC.
Date: September 15, 2021Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.