Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brantley, Mary Ann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zoucha, Joseph R, against Alvarez, Maria Leticia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew C. Braner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Brantley, Mary Ann. Refers to: Alvarez, Maria
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Brantley, Mary Ann.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/06/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brantley, Mary Ann. Refers to: Alvarez, Maria
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Complaint filed by Brantley, Mary Ann. Refers to: Alvarez, Maria
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Brantley, Mary Ann.
Date: December 20, 2021Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021
Date: November 11, 2021Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: December 02, 2022Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/02/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 02, 2022Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/10/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 10, 2021Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: December 10, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.