Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Fregoso, Tania, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W Pollack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W Pollack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: Fregoso, Tania
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: May 07, 2021DL-30 issued.
Date: April 18, 2023Request for Entry of Default filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: Fregoso, Tania
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE CCP 1033) filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/19/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: Fregoso, Tania
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.