Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ocean Place Retail Vii Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Burton, Anthony W; Seide, Richard L, Seide, Richard L, against Regal Cinemas Inc, represented by Edmiston, W Allan, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Ocean Place Retail VII LLC. Refers to: Regal Cinemas Inc
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ocean Place Retail VII LLC. Refers to: Regal Cinemas Inc
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Ocean Place Retail VII LLC.
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (continuace) filed by Regal Cinemas Inc.
Date: May 26, 2021Answer filed by Regal Cinemas Inc.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry Of Order Continuing Hearing) filed by Regal Cinemas Inc.
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.