Progressive West Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Nivinskus, Mark R,
against
Castro, Daniel Richard,
Mccaffrey, James E,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Details for
Progressive West Insurance Company v. Castro, Daniel Richard
, et al.
Case Events for
Progressive West Insurance Company v. Castro, Daniel Richard
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
April 20, 2023
Docket Event
DL-30 issued.
April 14, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.
April 14, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.
April 14, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Progressive West Insurance Company and against Castro, Daniel Richard ;McCaffrey, James E for $ 3500.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 363.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3863.00.
April 01, 2021
Docket Event
The default filed by Progressive West Insurance Company was entered as to Castro, Daniel Richard; McCaffrey, James E on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.
April 01, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (WITH DISMISSAL OF DOES AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: Castro, Daniel; McCaffrey, James
February 01, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: McCaffrey, James
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Refers to: Castro, Daniel
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.