We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Navarro, Anthony ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Limited
case
represented by
Sonntag, Albert R ,
against
Alex Greek Cafe ,
Salcedo, Jorge ,
Salcedo, Margarita ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Filing Date
November 24, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 05, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Events for
Navarro, Anthony v. Alex Greek Cafe
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 08, 2021
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Navarro, Anthony, on 11/25/2020, has expired.
January 06, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.
January 05, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Salcedo, Margarita .
January 05, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Navarro, Anthony.
Get Document
January 05, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Salcedo, Jorge .
January 05, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Navarro, Anthony .
January 05, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Alex Greek Cafe.
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
November 25, 2020
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Navarro, Anthony.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.