Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reyes, Ruth Delos, Richard, Ray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Najar, Charlotte, against Chadwick, Ruby L, represented by Yoakum, Robert Millard, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: July 28, 2021Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Chadwick, Ruby L.
Date: January 27, 2021Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: April 15, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: April 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Richard, Ray; Reyes, Ruth Delos. Refers to: Chadwick, Ruby
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Richard, Ray; Reyes, Ruth Delos. Refers to: Chadwick, Ruby
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: July 28, 2021Complaint filed by Richard, Ray; Reyes, Ruth Delos. Refers to: Chadwick, Ruby
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.