Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cribb, Steven D, against Ecegc Inc; Dba : E C E G C Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc. Refers to: ECEGC Inc
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc. Refers to: ECEGC Inc
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: September 02, 2021[Another document for ROA# 29]
Date: December 14, 2021E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: December 14, 2021Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc. Refers to: ECEGC Inc
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc. Refers to: ECEGC Inc
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: November 17, 2021Writ of Execution (Yolo) filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc.
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.