Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sapp, Joseph, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Han, Douglas, against Dei Sales Inc; Esa : Sound United Llc, Sound United Llc, represented by Buckley, Aaron A; Hambly, Kevin B; Hambly, Kevin B., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kenneth J Medel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J Medel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Sapp, Joseph. Refers to: DEI Sales Inc
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Complaint filed by Sapp, Joseph. Refers to: DEI Sales Inc
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sapp, Joseph. Refers to: DEI Sales Inc
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer filed by Sound United LLC.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed by Sapp, Joseph. Refers to: DEI Sales Inc
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Granting Joint Stipulation) filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Answer filed by DEI Sales Inc.
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by DEI Sales Inc.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Sapp, Joseph received but not filed on 04/21/2023.
Date: April 21, 2023Case Management Statement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/07/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: April 21, 2023Declaration - Other (of Douglas Han) filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: April 21, 2023Case Management Statement filed by DEI Sales Inc.
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/15/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Cassandra Polites) filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: April 21, 2023Declaration - Other filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 10/14/2022 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/11/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion for Approval of Class Settlement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF DOUGLAS HAN) filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/29/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by DEI Sales Inc.
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Sapp, Joseph received but not filed on 10/27/2022.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Approval of Class Settlement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by DEI Sales Inc.
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Joseph Sapp) filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Joint Status Report filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/13/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: May 25, 2023Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/13/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/26/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: May 26, 2023Notice of Entry of Order filed by Sapp, Joseph.
Date: June 09, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.