Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Buckley, Robert W, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Self-Represented, against Anvari, Al, Baugrid Usa Llc, represented by Kanter, Elliott, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Original Summons filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al; BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default ((Not Entered)) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 18]
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al; BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 13]
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 11]
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 63]
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (with Prejudice as to DOES 1 through 10 ONLY) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 50]
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (to compel post judgment discovery responses) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 68]
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court (Not Filed) submitted by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W rejected on 12/17/2021.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: Interest) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W rejected on 08/23/2021.
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/22/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: August 10, 2022Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: November 10, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/03/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: February 03, 2023Proof of Service filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: November 10, 2022Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ELLIOTT N. KANTER) filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - Other (OF ROBERT W BUCKLEY) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Default Judgment) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W.
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al; BauGrid USA LLC
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BauGrid USA LLC; Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Motion - Other (FOR RELIEF) filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Anvari, Al; BauGrid USA LLC.
Date: November 10, 2022E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Robert W Buckley) filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by BUCKLEY, ROBERT W. Refers to: Anvari, Al
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Response (to Opposition to Set Aside the Judgment) filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA #64) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Al Anvari) filed by Anvari, Al.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Whitney, Richard S. to Timothy Taylor effective 07/15/2021
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/03/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.